+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2008
On November 2, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2007
On October 12, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 2, 2007
On October 5, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 12, 2007
On September 5, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 5, 2007
On August 24, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 5, 2007
On August 17, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 24, 2007
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 17, 2007
On August 4, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 10, 2007
On July 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 4, 2007
On June 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
On June 22, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
On June 15, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Filed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 022-000-000
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.19b new -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.28 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.675 new -
- 735 ILCS 5/8-911 - from Ch. 110, par. 8-911
- 735 ILCS 5/8-912 new -
- 745 ILCS 49/63 new -