+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 28, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0677
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 28, 2004
On June 16, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Roger L. Eddy
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 062-051-001
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-002-001
On May 24, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On May 17, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert S. Molaro
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-012-001
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Insurance & Pensions; 010-000-000
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance & Pensions
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Insurance & Pensions; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 28, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-039-000
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Sponsor Removed Rep. John E. Bradley
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-004-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill and makes the following additional change: Provides that the total amount of payments to defray health insurance costs in any year may not exceed 75% of the total cost of health insurance coverage in that year for all recipients.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/17-142.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-142.1
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2004: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, May 26, 2004
May 13, 2004: HB1269 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 13, 2004
April 2, 2004: HB1269 - Third Reading - Friday, April 02, 2004
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor