+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0503
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2016
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Deletes language requiring a data collector that owns or licenses personal information and suffers a single breach of the security of the data concerning the personal information of more than 250 Illinois residents to provide notice to the Attorney General of the breach.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Personal Information Protection Act. Includes breaches of security involving medical information, health insurance information, and certain unique biometric data to the types of breaches for which notice is required. Adds requirements concerning notices disclosing a breach of security involving a user name or email address in combination with a password or security question and answer. Permits substitute notice to prominent local media under specified conditions. Requires notice of a breach of security to be provided to the Attorney General under certain circumstances. Requires certain data collectors to use reasonable security measures to protect records. Provides that a covered entity or business associate that is subject to and in compliance with the privacy and security standards for the protection of electronic health information under the federal Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 and the Health Information Technology for Economic and Clinical Health Act is deemed to be in compliance with the Personal Information Protection Act if a covered entity or business associate required to provide notification of a breach to the Secretary of Health and Human Services under the Health Information Technology for Economic and Clinical Health Act also provides the notification to the Attorney General within 5 business days of notifying the Secretary. Adds and changes definitions.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 805 ILCS 105/101.01 - from Ch. 32, par. 101.01
- 805 ILCS 105/101.01 -
- 815 ILCS 530/5 -
- 815 ILCS 530/10 -
- 815 ILCS 530/12 -
- 815 ILCS 530/45 new -
- 815 ILCS 530/50 new -