+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/21-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 21-1
- 720 ILCS 5/21-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 21-3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor