+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 5, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
On September 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 2, 2007
On August 21, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 22, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William R. Haine
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the bill as introduced with the following changes: Eliminates the provision that the Act applies to a patient's "complete" electronic health records and conditions patient consent upon the patient's ability to give consent. Authorizes ILHIN to assist associations of health care providers as well as health care providers, and specifies that assistance is in accordance with federal law. Specifies those persons and providers ILHIN may charge fees. Specifies the conditions under which the Department may make ILHIN data available. Makes changes in the ILHIN governing board. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2007: HB1254 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 24, 2007
March 22, 2007: HB1254 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor