+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 750 ILCS 60/Art. V heading new -
- 750 ILCS 60/501 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/505 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/510 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/515 new -
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor