+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 22, 2007: HB1243 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor