+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 17, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0648
- Effective Date October 11, 2007
On October 11, 2007 in the House:
- Both Houses Override Total Veto
On October 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 059-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael Bond
On October 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto October 11, 2007
On October 3, 2007 in the House:
- Override Governor Veto - House Passed 111-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 2, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Sandy Cole
On September 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto October 2, 2007
On August 16, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2007
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 011-000-000
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 31, 2007
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Remains in Revenue Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue Committee; 003-000-000
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
October 11, 2007: HB1242 - Motion - Thursday, October 11, 2007
October 3, 2007: HB1242 - Motion - Wednesday, October 03, 2007
May 22, 2007: HB1242 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
April 20, 2007: HB1242 - Third Reading - Friday, April 20, 2007
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor