+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 22, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0471
- Effective Date August 22, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Held in Criminal Law
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2011
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause and reinserts the provisions of the original bill, but makes the changes in a Section of the Illinois Vehicle Code concerning driving under the influence of alcohol instead of in the Section concerning driver involvement in a personal injury or fatal motor vehicle accident. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.2 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501.2
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.6 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501.6