+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0097
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron Schock
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 750/9-4.3 - from Ch. 127, par. 2709-4.3
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2007: HB1241 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
March 22, 2007: HB1241 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor