+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 30, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0057
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2011
On June 28, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-025-000
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2011
On May 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Held in Appropriations II
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 16, 2011
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-026-000
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-General Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to various agencies. Effective July 1, 2011.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Further amends the bill by making supplemental appropriations and reappropriations to the Court of Claims and changing, adding, and eliminating various appropriations. Changes the effective date by making certain provisions effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Further amends the bill by changing and adding various appropriations.