+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0060
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 006-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2007
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 008-000-004
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2007: HB1236 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
March 22, 2007: HB1236 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor