+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Rutherford
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno; -Rutherford
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno; Radogno-Rutherford
On May 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Added as Co-Sponsor-Senator Halvorson
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno; -Rutherford
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Rutherford
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christine Radogno
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-004-000
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the substantive provisions of the introduced bill. Defines "sensitive material" to include an individual's first name or initial and last name together with any one or more of listed data elements.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the substantive provisions of the introduced bill. Defines "sensitive material" to include an individual's first name or initial and last name together with any one or more of listed data elements.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 20, 2007: HB1235 - Third Reading - Friday, April 20, 2007
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor