+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans Affairs Committee; 012-000-000
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron Schock
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. James H. Meyer
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 22, 2007: HB1232 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor