+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0112
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Commerce; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2021: HB0122
May 6, 2021: HB0122 - Commerce
April 16, 2021: HB0122
April 16, 2021: HB0122 - Third Reading
March 1, 2021: HB0122 - Consumer Protection
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor