+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On August 6, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0277
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anna Moeller
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Labor; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
- Assigned to Labor
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Affirmatively provides that an employer may request an applicant to verify the aggregate amount of unvested equity or deferred compensation the applicant would forgo by resigning the applicant's current position.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003 in relation to an employer seeking an applicant's salary history. Provides that information concerning unvested equity or deferred compensation may be discussed.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 820 ILCS 55/10 - from Ch. 48, par. 2860
- 820 ILCS 112/10 -