+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 6, 2003 in the House:
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
On October 23, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto November 4, 2003
On July 29, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 6, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2003
- Referred to Rules
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 014-000-000
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -