+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-005-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 30/0.01 - from Ch. 48, par. 2d.9
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: HFA0001 - Labor & Commerce
March 11, 2021: HB1204 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor