+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 10, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0335
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 047-003-000
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Labor; 012-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-014-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2021: HB0012 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: HB0012 - Labor
April 14, 2021: HB0012 - Third Reading
March 3, 2021: HB0012 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor