+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0389
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Health; 013-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Health
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that "prescription drug" does not include a drug for the treatment of cancer that can only be dispensed to a patient registered with the drug manufacturer in accordance with the federal Food and Drug Administration's requirements. Provides that when dispensing a drug to an eligible patient, the recipient must do so at no cost to the eligible patient, except that a uniform reasonable handling fee (rather than a reasonable handling fee) may be charged.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Illinois Drug Reuse Opportunity Program Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other law or rule, donors may donate drugs to recipients and recipients may receive donated drugs from donors. Provides that recipients shall only dispense or administer drugs to eligible patients, further donate drugs to another recipient, or dispose of drugs in accordance with specified provisions. Provides that drugs donated for use under the Act are considered nonsaleable. Provides that, when dispensing a drug to an eligible patient, the recipient must do so at no cost to the eligible patient, except that a reasonable handling fee may be charged. Provides that recipients may only dispense or administer a prescription drug or provide an over-the-counter drug if specified requirements are met. Provides that recipients shall, to the greatest extent practicable, dispense drugs received under the Act to priority patients. Provides that drugs may be accepted under the Act only if specified requirements are met. Contains requirements for the further donation of drugs by a recipient. Contains provisions regarding the disposition of specified drugs. Provides that nothing in the Act requires that a pharmacy or pharmacist be a recipient of drugs under the Act. Provides that the Act shall supersede any inconsistent law or rule for activities conducted under the Act. Contains other provisions. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act, the Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act, the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Act, the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tort Claims Act to provide that persons engaged in donating or accepting, or packaging, repackaging, or labeling, prescription drugs to the extent permitted or required under the Illinois Drug Reuse Opportunity Program Act are exempt from provisions of those other
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- New Act
- 225 ILCS 85/4 - from Ch. 111, par. 4124
- 225 ILCS 120/15 - from Ch. 111, par. 8301-15
- 320 ILCS 50/10
- 410 ILCS 620/16 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 516
- 720 ILCS 570/102 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1102
- 740 ILCS 20/3 - from Ch. 70, par. 903