+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 40 ILCS 5/7-116 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-116
- 40 ILCS 5/7-139 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-139
- 40 ILCS 5/7-147 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-147
- 40 ILCS 5/7-174 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-174
- 30 ILCS 805/8.29 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor