+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Held in Local Government
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-042-004
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elections and Campaign Reform Committee; 008-001-000
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections and Campaign Reform Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Election Code. Requires that at a minimum, principals of secondary and vocational schools request appointment as deputy registrars and conduct voter registration in their school district the first 10 school days of May to register students who will be 18 or older on the next election day. Permits appointment of a volunteer substitute if the same registration is conducted. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 10 ILCS 5/4-6.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 4-6.2
- 10 ILCS 5/5-16.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 5-16.2
+ − Vote
March 27, 2003: HB1166 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2003
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor