+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 10, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0136
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 5, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 27, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-004
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 016-000-000
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey