+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0049
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Provides that data sets made available are provided for informational purposes only. Provides that the Secretary of State does not warrant the completeness, accuracy, content, or fitness for any particular purpose or use of any public data set made available on the web portal, nor are such warranties to be implied or inferred with respect to the public data sets furnished under the Acts. Provides that the State does not incur liability related to the data made available. Changes the effective date to January 1, 2022.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 805 ILCS 5/1.25 - from Ch. 32, par. 1.25
- 805 ILCS 5/1.80 - from Ch. 32, par. 1.80
- 805 ILCS 105/101.25 - from Ch. 32, par. 101.25
- 805 ILCS 105/115.90 new -
- 805 ILCS 180/50-5 -
- 805 ILCS 180/50-10 -