+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 155/1 - from Ch. 38, par. 156-11
+ − Vote
March 11, 2021: HB1146 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor