+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 015-002-002
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Election Code and the School Code. Provides that if a school is designated as a polling place, then the school board shall close that school on the day of the election, and the school district may close any other schools that same day. Removes the prohibition on a school board designating or observing as a special holiday on which teachers or other school employees are not required to work the days on which general elections for members of the Illinois House of Representatives are held.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/3-11 - from Ch. 122, par. 3-11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor