+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
February 8, 2017: HB0114 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor