+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Remains in Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
- Recommends Be Adopted Sub-committee/ Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 002-003-000; Lost
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Churchill
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/12-611 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 12-611
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor