+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Statutes of Limitation
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution may be commenced at any time when the victim is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense for: solicitation to meet a child, child pornography, posting of identifying or graphic information on a pornographic Internet site or possessing graphic information with pornographic material, non-consensual dissemination of private sexual images, grooming, or traveling to meet a minor.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 720 ILCS 5/12-3.2 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-3.2
- 720 ILCS 5/3-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-5
- 720 ILCS 5/3-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-6
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2016: HB1129 - Third Reading
May 25, 2016: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 14, 2015: HB1129 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor