+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 25, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0671
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 25, 2009
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-001
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Licensed Activities
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Held in Licensed Activities
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2009: SCA0002 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 28, 2009
May 15, 2009: HB1119 - Third Reading - Friday, May 15, 2009
March 24, 2009: HB1119 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 24, 2009
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor