+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0228
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kevin Joyce; Motion #1
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Maloney
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Executive; 012-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 20, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-006-005
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 009-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Reinserts the contents of the bill with changes. Provides that the tuition increase limitation applies only to those students who first enroll after the 2003-2004 academic year (instead of having the limitation apply beginning with the 2004-2005 academic year). Effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Provides that if the student changes majors, the tuition charged the student shall equal the amount the student would have been charged had he or she been admitted to the changed major when he or she first enrolled.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Provides that if the student changes majors, the tuition charged the student shall equal the amount the student would have been charged had he or she been admitted to the changed major when he or she first enrolled.