+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 310 ILCS 10/1 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1