+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Remains in Revenue Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote; Revenue Sub-committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lee A. Daniels
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the credit is for the purchase of assistive technology devices (now, for assistive devices). Defines "assistive technology device" as any item, piece of equipment, or product system, whether acquired commercially, off the shelf, modified, or customized, that is used to increase, maintain, or improve functional capabilities of individuals with disabilities.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the credit is for the purchase of assistive technology devices (now, for assistive devices). Defines "assistive technology device" as any item, piece of equipment, or product system, whether acquired commercially, off the shelf, modified, or customized, that is used to increase, maintain, or improve functional capabilities of individuals with disabilities.