+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On April 7, 2005 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis; As Amended
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis; As Amended
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis; As Amended
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis; As Amended
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis; As Amended
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Roger Jenisch
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-004-000
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Roger Jenisch
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John J. Millner
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that a person that commits disorderly conduct by possessing while on, bringing onto, or causing to be brought onto school property, a device manufactured and designed to be substantially similar in appearance to a firearm without the consent of the chief security officer for the school property is guilty of a Class C misdemeanor (instead of a Class A misdemeanor).
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/26-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 26-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor