+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay