+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
- Session Sine Die
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
- First Reading
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-002-000
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Provides that the exemption to an eavesdropping violation that with prior request to and written or verbal approval of the State's Attorney of the county in which the conversation is anticipated to occur, recording or listening with the aid of an eavesdropping device to a conversation in which a law enforcement officer, or any person acting at the direction of a law enforcement officer, is a party to the conversation and has consented to the conversation being intercepted or recorded in the course of an investigation of a qualified offense is inoperative on and after January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2023). Extends the repeal of the RICO Article of the Code from June 11, 2022 to June 11, 2024. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 720 ILCS 5/5-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 5-1
- 720 ILCS 5/14-3
- 720 ILCS 5/33G-9