+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Insurance Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance Committee; 004-013-006
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Careen M. Gordon
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.3f -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.15 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -