+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 5, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0113
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lovana Jones
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 010-004-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2005: HB1081 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 11, 2005
March 9, 2005: HB1081 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 09, 2005
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor