+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 230 ILCS 20/3.1 -
- 230 ILCS 20/3.2 -
- 230 ILCS 30/6 - from Ch. 120, par. 1126
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor