+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 6, 2013 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Pam Roth
On July 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On June 4, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Arrived in House
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
On May 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2012
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On May 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
On January 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2011
On November 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-002-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 9, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 10, 2011
On November 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On November 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011
On November 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 10, 2011
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael G. Connelly
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Designations Act. Makes a technical change in a provision concerning the short title.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Designations Act. Makes a technical change in a provision concerning the short title.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2012: HB1076 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 31, 2012
March 3, 2011: HB1076 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 03, 2011
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor