+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-Referred to Rules Committee
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lovana Jones
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Remains in Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lovana Jones
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that in order to qualify for the exemption the physicians' group must have its principal office in a municipality with fewer than 50,000 inhabitants and be situated within 5 miles of the principal business office of the health care plan. Limits application of the exemption to pharmacy providers located in Champaign or Piatt county.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that in order to qualify for the exemption the physicians' group must have its principal office in a municipality with fewer than 50,000 inhabitants and be situated within 5 miles of the principal business office of the health care plan. Limits application of the exemption to pharmacy providers located in Champaign or Piatt county.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor