+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 10, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0193
- Effective Date August 10, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2009
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Also includes a member of the United States Congress, a Judge of the United States, a Justice of the United States, a United States Magistrate Judge, and a Bankruptcy Judge in the definition of "public official".
+ − Statute Amended
- 740 ILCS 110/12 - from Ch. 91 1/2, par. 812
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2009: HB1065 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 13, 2009
March 24, 2009: HB1065 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 24, 2009
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor