+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1128
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-013-000
On January 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2023
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-047-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person who was under the age of 21 and is serving a sentence for first degree murder or a term of natural life imprisonment shall be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board after serving 40 years or more of his or her sentence or sentences.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
January 10, 2023: HB1064 - Third Reading
April 22, 2021: HB1064 - Third Reading
April 20, 2021: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
March 11, 2021: HB1064 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor