+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-053-000
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Correctional Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Rich Brauer
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rich Brauer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rich Brauer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; 006-004-000
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall operate a toll-free number to arrange for the immediate pick-up and transportation of minor offenders to detention facilities throughout the State pursuant to the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. In the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, provides that whenever it appears that a minor, who is at least 10 years of age and who is arrested pursuant to the Act if there is probable cause to believe that the minor is a delinquent minor, will need to be detained for longer than 6 hours in a county jail or a municipal lockup, the arresting authority shall notify the Department of Human Services to arrange for the immediate pickup and transportation of the arrested minor to and from a detention facility. Provides that a minor may remain in the county jail or municipal lockup for as long as it takes for the Department to provide for pickup and transportation.