+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 24, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0074
- Effective Date July 24, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Environment; 008-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Green Governments Illinois Act. Provides that the Council shall participate in the proposal review subgrant award processes conducted by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to distribute the portion of funds eligible for State government use under the federal Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007. Provides that a designee of the Governor shall also participate in these processes and that no subgrant may be awarded unless the Governor's designee first approves that subgrant. Changes the dates by which the Council must have completed various duties. Makes other technical changes.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2009: HB1042 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 13, 2009
April 2, 2009: HB1042 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 02, 2009
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor