+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kevin Joyce
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-005-000
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 006-003-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 18, 2007
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-023-002
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue Committee; 002-000-000
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 010-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule April 30, 2007
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the substantive provisions of the bill with changes. Provides that the net revenue from the scratch-out multiple sclerosis scratch-off game shall be appropriated to the Department of Public Health for the purpose of making grants to organizations in Illinois that conduct research pertaining to the repair of damage caused by an acquired demyelinating disease of the central nervous system (instead of organizations in Illinois conducting research pertaining to multiple sclerosis). Defines "research". Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20 ILCS 1605/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 1152
- 20 ILCS 1605/20 - from Ch. 120, par. 1170
- 20 ILCS 1605/21.7 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.675 new -
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2008: HB1040 - Third Reading - Friday, May 23, 2008
May 16, 2007: HB1040 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor