+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 020-000-000
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 605 ILCS 5/6-901 - from Ch. 121, par. 6-901
- 605 ILCS 5/6-905 - from Ch. 121, par. 6-905
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor