+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 30, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0555
- Effective Date August 30, 2007
- Governor Approved
On July 5, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 6, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-000
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to issue an annual report (on or before May 1) to the General Assembly and Governor identifying each school district's special education expenditures; receipts received from State, federal, and local sources; and net special education expenditures over receipts received, if applicable. Provides that expenditures and receipts shall be calculated in a manner specified by the State Board using data obtained from the Annual Financial Report, the Funding and Child Tracking System, and district enrollment information. Effective July 1, 2007.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/1A-4 - from Ch. 122, par. 1A-4
- 105 ILCS 5/17-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 17-1
- 105 ILCS 5/34-43 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-43
- 30 ILCS 805/8.31 new -
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2007: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, June 06, 2007
May 16, 2007: HB1030 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
March 28, 2007: HB1030 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor