+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/224.1 - from Ch. 73, par. 836.1