+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 008-000-000
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith